List of vice presidents of Indonesia facts for kids
The vice president of the Republic of Indonesia (Indonesian: Wakil Presiden Republik Indonesia) is the second-highest officer in the executive branch of the Indonesian government, after the president, and ranks first in the presidential line of succession. Since 2004, the president and vice president are directly elected to a five-year term.
The vice presidency was established during the formulation of the 1945 Constitution by the Investigating Committee for Preparatory Work for Independence (BPUPK), a research body for the preparation of Indonesian independence. On 18 August 1945, the Preparatory Committee for Indonesian Independence (PPKI), which was created on 7 August to replace the BPUPK, selected Sukarno as the country's first president and Mohammad Hatta as vice president.
Vice presidents
Independent (1 president, 5 vice presidents) Golkar (2 presidents, 6 vice presidents) National Awakening Party (1 president) Indonesian Democratic Party of Struggle (2 presidents, 1 vice president) United Development Party (1 vice president) Democratic Party (1 president) Gerindra Party (1 president) |
No. | Portrait | Name (Birth–Death) |
Term of office | Political party | President(s) | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Took office | Left office | Time in office | ||||||
1 | Mohammad Hatta (1902–1980) |
18 August 1945 | 1 December 1956 | 11 years, 105 days | Independent | Sukarno | ||
Vacant (1 December 1956 – 23 March 1973) | ||||||||
2 | Hamengkubuwono IX (1912–1988) |
23 March 1973 | 23 March 1978 | 5 years | Independent | Suharto | ||
3 | Adam Malik (1917–1984) |
23 March 1978 | 11 March 1983 | 4 years, 353 days | Golkar | |||
4 | Umar Wirahadikusumah (1924–2003) |
11 March 1983 | 11 March 1988 | 5 years | Golkar | |||
5 | Sudharmono (1927–2006) |
11 March 1988 | 11 March 1993 | 5 years | Golkar | |||
6 | Try Sutrisno (born 1935) |
11 March 1993 | 11 March 1998 | 5 years | Golkar | |||
7 | B. J. Habibie (1936–2019) |
11 March 1998 | 21 May 1998 | 71 days | Golkar | |||
Vacant (21 May 1998 – 21 October 1999) | ||||||||
8 | Megawati Sukarnoputri (born 1947) |
21 October 1999 | 23 July 2001 | 1 year, 275 days | Indonesian Democratic Party of Struggle | Abdurrahman Wahid | ||
Vacant (23–26 July 2001) | ||||||||
9 | Hamzah Haz (born 1940) |
26 July 2001 | 20 October 2004 | 3 years, 86 days | United Development Party | Megawati Sukarnoputri | ||
10 | Jusuf Kalla (born 1942) |
20 October 2004 | 20 October 2009 | 5 years | Golkar | Susilo Bambang Yudhoyono | ||
11 | Boediono (born 1943) |
20 October 2009 | 20 October 2014 | 5 years | Independent | |||
12 (10) |
Jusuf Kalla (born 1942) |
20 October 2014 | 20 October 2019 | 5 years | Golkar | Joko Widodo | ||
13 | Ma'ruf Amin (born 1943) |
20 October 2019 | Incumbent | 4 years, 344 days | Independent | |||
14 | Gibran Rakabuming Raka (born 1987) |
Taking office 20 October 2024 |
−22 days | Independent | Prabowo Subianto (elected) |
By age
# | Vice president | Born | Age at start of vice presidency |
Age at end of vice presidency |
Post-VP timespan | Lifespan | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Died | Age | ||||||
1 | Mohammad Hatta | 12 August 1902 | 43 years, 6 days 18 August 1945 |
54 years, 111 days 1 December 1956 |
23 years, 165 days | 14 May 1980 | 77 years, 276 days |
2 | Hamengkubuwono IX | 12 April 1912 | 60 years, 345 days 23 March 1973 |
65 years, 345 days 23 March 1978 |
10 years, 193 days | 2 October 1988 | 76 years, 173 days |
3 | Adam Malik | 22 July 1917 | 60 years, 244 days 23 March 1978 |
65 years, 232 days 11 March 1983 |
1 year, 178 days | 5 September 1984 | 67 years, 45 days |
4 | Umar Wirahadikusumah | 10 October 1924 | 58 years, 152 days 11 March 1983 |
63 years, 153 days 11 March 1988 |
15 years, 10 days | 21 March 2003 | 78 years, 162 days |
5 | Sudharmono | 12 March 1927 | 60 years, 365 days 11 March 1988 |
65 years, 364 days 11 March 1993 |
12 years, 320 days | 25 January 2006 | 78 years, 319 days |
6 | Try Sutrisno | 15 November 1935 | 57 years, 116 days 11 March 1993 |
62 years, 116 days 11 March 1998 |
26 years, 201 days | (living) | 88 years, 318 days |
7 | B. J. Habibie | 25 June 1936 | 61 years, 259 days 11 March 1998 |
61 years, 330 days 21 May 1998 |
21 years, 113 days | 11 September 2019 | 83 years, 78 days |
8 | Megawati Sukarnoputri | 23 January 1947 | 52 years, 271 days 21 October 1999 |
54 years, 181 days 23 July 2001 |
23 years, 67 days | (living) | 77 years, 249 days |
9 | Hamzah Haz | 15 February 1940 | 61 years, 161 days 26 July 2001 |
64 years, 248 days 20 October 2004 |
19 years, 344 days | (living) | 84 years, 226 days |
10 | Jusuf Kalla | 15 May 1942 | 62 years, 158 days 20 October 2004 |
67 years, 158 days 20 October 2009 |
5 years, 0 days | (living) | 82 years, 136 days |
11 | Boediono | 25 February 1943 | 66 years, 237 days 20 October 2009 |
71 years, 237 days 20 October 2014 |
9 years, 344 days | (living) | 81 years, 216 days |
12 | Jusuf Kalla | 15 May 1942 | 72 years, 158 days 20 October 2014 |
77 years, 158 days 20 October 2019 |
4 years, 344 days | (living) | 82 years, 136 days |
13 | Ma'ruf Amin | 11 March 1943 | 76 years, 223 days 20 October 2019 |
(incumbent) | (incumbent) | (living) | 81 years, 201 days |
14 | Gibran Rakabuming Raka | 1 October 1987 | 37 years, 19 days 20 October 2024 |
(living) | 36 years, 363 days | ||
# | Vice president | Born | Age at start of vice presidency |
Age at end of vice presidency |
Post-VP timespan | Lifespan | |
Died | Age |